BOLTON UNDER FIVES FORUM

Charity number: 519403
Charity reporting is up to date (107 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 April 2021 88 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 May 2021 107 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 August 2020 185 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 03 August 2020 185 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 18 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 March 2018 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 22 March 2018 50 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 24 April 2017 83 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 06 March 2017 34 days late Download