BOLTON UNDER FIVES FORUM

Charity number: 519403
Charity reporting is up to date (107 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £68.28k £56.52k £79.57k £68.49k £61.55k
Total expenditure £72.89k £71.92k £85.08k £78.84k £69.37k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A