THE MABEL FOUNDATION C.I.O.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mabel implements a multidisciplinary approach to eradicating period poverty in remote regions of Africa. We work with local communities and organisations on the ground to distribute reusable period products, empower through menstrual lessons, teach local sewing groups to make reusable pads turning them into micro-enterprises and initiate surveys to better understand and support these communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kenya
- South Africa
- Uganda
- Zambia
Governance
- 06 July 2022: CIO registration
- THE MABEL FOUNDATION C.I.C. (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lauren Mellor | Chair | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Grant Kark | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kate Megan McCaslin | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Marie Spillane | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.85k | £13.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36 | £56 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 11 December 2024 | 286 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 11 December 2024 | 286 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO RELIEVE POVERTY, AMONG THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD, BUT IN PARTICULAR AFRICA, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUSTAINABLE FEMININE HYGIENE PRODUCTS AND BY TEACHING AND TRAINING WOMEN TO MAKE THESE PRODUCTS, AND TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE HEALTH BY MAKING THESE PRODUCTS AVAILABLE AND BY EDUCATING WOMEN ABOUT MENSTRUATION AND THEIR OWN BODIES, ALLOWING INFORMED DECISION MAKING AND ACCESS TO LIFE OPPORTUNITIES INCLUDING ACCESS TO EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE BROADGATE TOWER
THIRD FLOOR
20 PRIMROSE STREET
LONDON
EC2A 2RS
- Phone:
- +447872888383
- Email:
- hello@themabelfoundation.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window