HOPE CMA DEBT CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hope CMA Debt centre is affiliated to Community Money Advice (Charity Number 1111436). We work closely with CMA to provide free debt advice to people in the Sutton Coldfield area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 30 March 2022: CIO registration
- HOPE DEBT CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Clare | Chair | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Walton | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Dean | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Colthup | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.87k | £1.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.24k | £2.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 17 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUTTON COLDFIELD AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY PROVIDING A FREE CONFIDENTIAL AND IMPARTIAL ADVICE SERVICE CONCERNING MONEY AND DEBT AND RELATED SUPPORT, SUCH SERVICES BEING PROVIDED WITH A CHRISTIAN ETHOS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
173 REDDICAP HEATH ROAD
SUTTON COLDFIELD
B75 7EN
- Phone:
- 07949937561
- Email:
- Hopedebtadvice@icloud.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window