GLOBAL RESEARCH ALLIANCE FOR SUSTAINABLE FINANCE AND INVESTMENT

Charity number: 1202401
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Advancing education and research in the subject of Sustainable Finance and Investment by promoting highly impactful academic research, developing academic collaboration internationally between researchers, nurturing the development of junior academics, promoting knowledge and raising standards in the form of facilitating academic research and publication in peer-reviewed articles and online.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Australia
  • Belgium
  • China
  • France
  • Germany
  • Italy
  • Mexico
  • Netherlands
  • New Zealand
  • Scotland
  • Singapore
  • Sweden
  • Switzerland
  • United States

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 March 2023: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PROFESSOR GIANFRANCO GIANFRATE Chair 05 December 2022
None on record
Prof Carlos Alberto Vargas Trustee 25 August 2023
None on record
Prof Chendi Zhang Trustee 25 August 2023
None on record
PROFESSOR TODD COURT Trustee 05 December 2022
None on record
Professor Robert Bauer Trustee 01 January 2017
None on record
Professor Ulrich Volz Trustee 01 January 2017
None on record
Dr Benjamin Lian Caldecott Trustee 01 January 2017
None on record
Dr Nina Seega Trustee 01 January 2017
None on record

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
6 CHARLOTTE STREET
BATH
BA1 2NE
Phone:
07377843882