Accounts and annual returns FURNESS MARITIME TRUST

Charity number: 519627
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 15 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 19 May 2024 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 19 May 2024 109 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 11 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 February 2021 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required