DERWENTSIDE HOSPICE CARE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 519659
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.11m £1.74m £1.45m £2.92m £1.20m
Total expenditure £1.33m £1.89m £1.44m £1.20m £1.18m
Income from government contracts £506.19k £483.00k N/A £496.64k £618.45k
Income from government grants £0 £0 £5.00k N/A £45.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £346.66k £463.38k £506.55k £2.10m £319.43k
Income - Other trading activities £256.30k £421.05k £432.92k £320.26k £264.85k
Income - Charitable activities £506.19k £857.24k £508.72k £496.64k £618.45k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £33.88k £47.53k £112.89k £0 £51.99k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £933.10k £1.29m £919.19k £850.75k £1.02m
Expenditure - Raising funds £395.84k £594.15k £518.38k £348.94k £155.98k
Expenditure - Governance £102.60k £111.66k £72.73k £0 £35.60k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0