DERWENTSIDE HOSPICE CARE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 519659
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Bennett Trustee 30 November 2018 None on record
MARK DAVIES Trustee None on record
PAUL JACKSON Chair None on record
Susan Elizabeth Brent Trustee 27 November 2019 None on record
MARK MCARDLE Trustee 30 October 2017
MENTAL HEALTH NORTH EAST LIMITED Received: On time
Dr Cindy Tanya Kelly Trustee 02 June 2021 None on record
ANNE BRITTON Trustee 21 September 2012 None on record
Lesley Telford Trustee 07 October 2020
THE CYRENIANS LTD Received: On time