MACCLESFIELD CRADLE CONCERN

Charity number: 519692
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity provides accommodation, advice and support to homeless pregnant young women or those with children under the age of three. Although most of the support is provided to young women in the Macclesfield area accommodation may also be given to young women outside this area.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016

Total income: £189,083
Total expenditure: £213,816

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire East
  • Cheshire West & Chester
  • Derbyshire
  • Lancashire
  • Staffordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 January 1988: Standard registration
  • 14 November 2018: Removed (Transfer of funds)
  • 14 November 2018: Funds transferred to 1081416 JUST DROP- IN YOUTH INFO & ADVICE LIMITED
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • MULBERRY HOUSE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016
Total gross income £271.40k £267.46k £182.87k £258.18k £189.08k
Total expenditure £277.05k £270.10k £245.86k £232.07k £213.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £137.66k £100.18k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 10 September 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 10 September 2018 222 days late
Annual return 31 March 2016 18 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

18 January 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2015 17 August 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015

(These accounts
have been qualified)

15 October 2015 On Time