ABERYSTWYTH AND DISTRICT STROKE CLUB

Charity number: 519695
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 05 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 28 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 16 September 2016 On time Download