ABERYSTWYTH AND DISTRICT STROKE CLUB

Charity number: 519695
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £23.29k £23.72k £27.17k £27.37k £24.26k
Total expenditure £22.37k £27.63k £27.54k £27.26k £22.04k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A