Accounts and annual returns DERBY FOOD 4 THOUGHT ALLIANCE

Charity number: 1198665
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 02 April 2024 13 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 02 April 2024 13 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 02 April 2023 28 February 2024 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 April 2023 04 April 2024 62 days late Download Open in new window