WELFARE AMBULANCE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 519727
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £18.51k £14.82k £19.25k £20.60k £5.68k
Total expenditure £17.85k £20.59k £19.71k £17.73k £1.14k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A