THE LANT CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Giving grants to people in need and to organisations that meet the scheme's criteria, leasing out the playing fields and clubhouse in Meeting House Lane, Balsall Common as a community sports facility and owning the Reading Room in Berkswell which is run as a community village hall by the Reading Room Committee on behalf of the Lant Charity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Solihull
Governance
- 07 October 2022: CIO registration
- 07 November 2024: Funds received from 234841 THE LANT CHARITY
- THE LANT TRUST (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Penelope Downing | Chair | 11 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Young | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|||||
David Bruce Healey | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dinah Edwards | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Anna Riemer | Trustee | 24 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kay Howles | Trustee | 24 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Diana Elizabeth Jagger | Trustee | 12 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Godfrey Thomas Chesshire | Trustee | 26 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, 4.1 THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF ANY RECREATION GROUND, OPEN SPACE, READING ROOM, LIBRARY AND VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT OR ANY PART THEREOF; 4.2 RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN OR WORKING OR STUDYING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. IN FULFILMENT OF THIS OBJECT THE TRUSTEES MAY PAY FOR SUCH ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES BY WAY OF DONATIONS OR SUBSCRIPTIONS TO INSTITUTIONS OR ORGANISATIONS WHICH PROVIDE SUCH ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES; AND 4.3 TO MAKE GRANTS FOR OR TOWARDS THE STIPEND OF ANY RECTOR, VICAR OR CURATE OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND HOLDING OFFICE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND TOWARDS THE COST OF ERECTING AND MAINTAINING ANY NEW CHURCH OR PARSONAGE OR OF MAINTAINING ANY EXISTING CHURCH OR PARSONAGE OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT OR OF EXTENSIONS TO ANY CHURCH OF ENGLAND CHURCH IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT OR TOWARDS THE COST OF ERECTING AND MAINTAINING ANY NEW CHURCH HALL OR OF MAINTAINING ANY EXISTING CHURCH HALL OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Wyatt Way
Meriden
Coventry
CV7 7SJ
- Phone:
- 07769224640
- Email:
- clerk.lantcharity@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window