THE LEICESTER MUSEUMS AND GALLERIES DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support the purchase of artworks and the development of services that are of educational, scientific, artistic or cultural interest for the benefit of the inhabitants of the City of Leicester. Such purchases are presented to the Leicester City Museum and Arts service for addition to the city's Public Collections. We raise funds through public donations, bequests, and corporate partnerships.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Leicester City
Governance
- 13 July 2022: CIO registration
- 14 February 2025: Funds received from 527876 THE CITY OF LEICESTER MUSEUMS TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Michael Gilding | Chair | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sally Horrocks | Trustee | 11 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rita Bullivant | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Ella Josephine Joyce | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £100 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £1.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 March 2024 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THROUGH THE PURCHASE OF WORKS AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF SERVICES WHICH ARE OF EDUCATIONAL, SCIENTIFIC, ARTISTIC OR CULTURAL INTEREST FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE CITY OF LEICESTER, SUCH WORKS TO BE PRESENTED TO AND SUCH SERVICES TO BE DELIVERED BY THE LEICESTER CITY MUSEUM AND ARTS SERVICE OR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE BODIES AND PUBLICLY FUNDED MUSEUMS AS MAY BE DECIDED BY THE CHARITY TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
City Hall
115 Charles Street
Leicester
LE1 1FZ
- Phone:
- 01164543111
- Email:
- museums@leicester.gov.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window