MOMS AGAINST POVERTY UK

Charity Number: 1199977
Charity reporting is up to date (89 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Relief of poverty

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 22 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 August 2022: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • MAP UK (Working name)
  • MAP (Previous name)
  • MOMS AGAINST POVERTY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Delfarib Fanaei Chair 05 August 2022
None on record
Shirin Hakim Trustee 05 August 2022
None on record
Ehsan Parvizian Trustee 05 August 2022
None on record
Bobak Cyrus Bakhtiari Trustee 05 August 2022
None on record
Ali Nourbakhsh Trustee 05 August 2022
None on record
Shadi Khakpour Trustee 05 August 2022
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 22/03/2023 22/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 22 March 2024 05 March 2025 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 22 March 2024 21 April 2025 89 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 22 March 2023 05 March 2025 408 days late
Accounts and TAR 22 March 2023 21 April 2025 455 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
10 Castlecombe Road
LONDON
SE9 4AT
Phone:
02076137136
Website:

No information available