KINGSBURY ACADEMY FUNDRAISING AND COMMUNITY GROUP

Charity number: 1198522
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity has the sole objective of serving to raise funds for specialist playground equipment for use by pupils at the school. Funding is sought from private and organisation donations, and from discrete fundraising activities. However, if this is achieved, then we still wish to run the charity for additional equipment and facilities for our children.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Total income: £13,682
Total expenditure: £295

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Coventry City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 April 2022: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Darch Chair 01 April 2022
None on record
Hugh McCallion Mr Trustee 26 February 2025
None on record
Roseanne Maher Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
Joanne Le Poidevin Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
Michaela Franklin Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £5.48k £13.68k
Total expenditure £0 £295
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 22 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2023 15 December 2023 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Kingsbury Academy
Kingsbury Road
Coundon
Coventry
CV6 1PJ
CV6 1PJ
Phone:
02476594952
Website:

No information available