CLOVERLANDS MODEL CAR MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity runs a model car museum as part of a larger visitor centre in LLanfair Caereinion, Powys SY21 0SF
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Powys
Governance
- 25 April 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN MALCOLM BLICK | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW GEORGE CHARMAN | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Nunn | Trustee | 09 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Percy Ward | Trustee | 09 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.79k | £3.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.29k | £2.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 January 2025 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 March 2025 | 145 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY AND DEVELOPMENT OF MOTOR TRANSPORT BY THE PRESERVATION AND DISPLAY OF MODEL CARS, PICTURES AND PHOTOGRAPHS AND OTHER MOTOR MEMORABILIA AND ALSO TO PRESERVE AND DISPLAY THEM TO EDUCATE AND INSPIRE PEOPLE OF ALL AGES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cloverlands Model Car Museum
The Station
Llanfair Caereinion
Powys
SY21 0SF
- Phone:
- 01938 810592
- Email:
- ANDREWCHARMAN@MACACE.NET
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window