ALT VALLEY COMMUNITY TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 519835
Charity reporting is up to date (41 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £2.34m £1.72m £2.52m £1.70m £1.77m
Total expenditure £1.66m £1.65m £2.16m £1.62m £1.44m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £165.03k £165.00k £165.00k
Income from government grants £307.12k £270.04k £619.22k £170.04k £370.19k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.50m £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £826.43k £1.71m £2.52m £1.70m £1.76m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £136 £1 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £15.75k £8.51k £6.21k £1.75k £11.07k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.66m £1.65m £2.16m £1.62m £1.44m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £9.00k £8.40k £13.23k £10.20k £10.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0