CADDINGTON HEATHFIELD CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To further or benefit the residents of Caddington and the neighbourhood, without distinction of sex, sexual orientation, race or of political, religious, or other opinions by associating together the said residents and the local authorities, voluntary and other organisations in a common effort to advance education and to provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England
Governance
- 29 April 2022: CIO registration
- THE HEATHFIELD CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert William Fitzsimmons | Chair | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Fitzsimmons | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Blake | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|||||
David Soper | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roy Charles Catford | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANNETTE SUSAN MCGOVERN | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Marion Soper | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Maureen Payton | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
ELLEN RITA TIMS | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|||||
John Waller | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Susan Diment | Trustee | 22 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.88k | £25.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.02k | £17.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 February 2024 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 February 2024 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF CADDINGTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS, OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Heathfield Centre
Hyde Road
Caddington
Bedfordshire
LU1 4HD
- Phone:
- 07922177131
- Email:
- heathfieldcentre@gmail.com
- Website:
-
heathfieldcentre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window