THE WALTON COMMUNITY SUPPORT PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charitable Foodbank for people in our local area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 16 June 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David N G Deycon | Chair | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexandrea Rose | Trustee | 14 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Beverly Tripp | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.86k | £15.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.69k | £8.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 09 February 2024 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 09 February 2024 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 16 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY, MAINLY IN THE WALTON PARISH AREA OF MILTON KEYNES (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY PROVIDING: FREE FOOD DELIVERIES (SURPLUS DONATIONS) FREE CHILDREN'S CLOTHING (USED DONATIONS) FREE AD-HOC ITEMS (DONATIONS E.G. USED WHITE GOODS), TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Walnut Tree Pavilion
Walnut Tree
Milton Keynes
Buckinghamshire
MK7 7DE
- Phone:
- 07985108588
- Email:
- WCSProject@mail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window