Trustees GRESLEY MALE VOICE CHOIR

Charity number: 519870
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr John Addison Chair 16 February 2018
None on record
DAVID HAYWOOD Trustee 27 January 2023
None on record
Christopher Lilley Trustee 26 January 2022
None on record
Peter Langley Trustee 26 January 2022
None on record
Terence John Jones Trustee 24 January 2020
None on record
Keith Harry Mithell Trustee 24 January 2020
None on record
HENRY ROBERT HURD Trustee 20 January 2017
None on record
Robert Edward Grummett Trustee 20 January 2017
None on record
Timothy Arthur Cox Trustee 20 January 2017
None on record
Dave Wright Trustee 17 October 2014
None on record
DEREK ROBERT BARTLETT Trustee
None on record
CLIVE HEATH LAWTON Trustee
None on record
Geoffrey Hampson Trustee
None on record
KARL WILLIAM HARPER Trustee
None on record
STEPHEN HICKMAN Trustee
None on record