EASTERN RAVENS TRUST

Charity number: 519907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £186.22k £125.69k £203.34k £212.29k £229.10k
Total expenditure £211.60k £161.74k £189.42k £225.63k £214.53k
Income from government contracts £105.12k £105.12k £105.12k £105.12k £105.12k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A