Accounts and annual returns THE BARN OUTDOOR PURSUITS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 519951
Charity reporting is up to date (124 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 03 June 2024 124 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 03 June 2024 124 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 08 March 2023 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 08 March 2023 36 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 November 2022 297 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 24 November 2022 297 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 May 2022 471 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 May 2022 471 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 03 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window