Accounts and annual returns LIVERPOOL ASTRONOMICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 519955
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 01 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required