Financial history LIVERPOOL ASTRONOMICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 519955
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £3.22k £3.44k £4.90k £4.17k £145
Total expenditure £4.01k £3.50k £4.59k £5.32k £1.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A