LIVERPOOL ASTRONOMICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education/Training
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 30 March 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Williams | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN SOUTHERN | Trustee | 19 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Broadfield | Trustee | 17 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Johnny Sheen | Trustee | 17 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Cain | Trustee | 17 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gabriel Becerra | Trustee | 17 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Smith | Trustee | 17 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Whittle | Trustee | 17 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Negus | Trustee | 17 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Galvin | Trustee | 18 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GALVIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COLIN MURRAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN BANKS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.17k | £145 | £30 | £3.63k | £3.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.32k | £1.07k | £241 | £4.13k | £6.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 OCTOBER 1987 AS AMENDED 11 DECEMBER 1987
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE SCIENCE OF ASTRONOMY AND PROMOTE RESEARCH IN ASTRONOMY AND ASSOCIATED SCIENES, TO CIRCULATE INFORMATION ON ASTRONOMICAL AND KINDRED SUBJECTS BY LECTURES, THE PUBLICATION OF ARTICLES, BOOKS AND TRANSACTIONS OR OTHERWISE, AND GENERALLY TO ENCOURAGE AND PROMOTE AN INTEREST IN ASTRONOMICAL STUDY AND OBSERVATION AND TO INCREAS POPULAR INTEREST IN THE SAID SCIENCE OR SCIENCES.
Area of benefit
PRIMARILY IN LIVERPOOL AND IN THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 NIGHTINGALE ROAD
LIVERPOOL
L12 0QF
- Phone:
- 07771854601
- Email:
- Chris.banks501@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window