Dogfen lywodraethu CARBON GAP LTD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 AUG 2021 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 21 APR 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 MAY 2022 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20 JUL 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22 SEP 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY EXISTS TO FURTHER THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF PROMOTING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT, INCLUDING THE ATMOSPHERE AND GLOBAL CLIMATE SYSTEM, AND ADVANCING THE SCIENCE OF CARBON REMOVAL AND RELATED TECHNOLOGIES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF PRACTICES AND TECHNOLOGIES THAT DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY REMOVE CARBON DIOXIDE OR OTHER IDENTIFIED GREENHOUSE GASSES FROM THE ATMOSPHERE (REFERRED TO AS “CARBON DIOXIDE REMOVAL”); (B) CARRYING OUT AND COMMISSIONING EVIDENCE-LED RESEARCH IN THE SUBJECT OF CARBON DIOXIDE REMOVAL AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS; (C) ORGANISING, CONVENING, FUNDING AND DELIVERING EDUCATIONAL AND RESEARCH PUBLICATIONS, ACTIVITIES AND EVENTS WITH KEY STAKEHOLDERS, ORGANISATIONS AND INDIVIDUALS; AND (D) BUILDING THE CAPACITY OF ACADEMICS, POLICYMAKERS, NGOS, THE PUBLIC AND OTHERS TO UNDERSTAND, ENGAGE WITH AND EVALUATE CARBON DIOXIDE REMOVAL.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.