Trustees BIRKENHEAD UNIT OF THE SEA CADET CORPS
Charity number: 520015
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DIANE CAMPBELL | Chair | 30 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Ronan Mrs | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Atkinson Mr | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Wright | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Glenis Viney | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael James Larsen | Trustee | 31 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN BARNETT | Trustee | 14 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
GARY CAMPBELL | Trustee | 14 September 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.