GLOBAL MISSION FOR CHRIST MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Objects of the CIO are, for the public benefit, the advancement of the Christian faith in the United Kingdom and overseas in particular, but without limitation, by the preaching and proclamation of the Christian gospel in a manner compatible with the Statement of Faith, the teaching of Christian doctrine and the demonstration of such faith by relieving those in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 25 August 2022: CIO registration
- THE GLOBAL MISSION (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pearson Muhone | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Blackson Mwampiki Mwaisoloka | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Zoya | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charles Gondwe | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pyela Chipeta Mwale | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 25 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, BY THE PREACHING AND PROCLAMATION OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL IN A MANNER COMPATIBLE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH, THE TEACHING OF CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE AND THE DEMONSTRATION OF SUCH FAITH BY RELIEVING THOSE IN NEED, PARTICULARLY THOSE WHO ARE VULNERABLE AND MARGINALISED FROM SOCIETY BY REASON OF AGE, DISABILITY, ILL-HEALTH, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER ECONOMIC OR SOCIAL DISADVANTAGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1-3 ST. OSWALDS VILLAGE
GAVEL WAY
GLOUCESTER
GL1 2UF
- Phone:
- 01452228413
- Email:
- gmcministries100@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window