Accounts and annual returns CHESTER UNIT 79 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 520031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 01 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 13 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 17 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required