FRIENDS OF CLAPHAM COMMON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Promote conservation, protection, improvement and biodiversity of the physical and natural environment of Clapham Common; and 2. To provide or assist in the provision of facilities and activities for the benefit of the inhabitants of south west London in particular but not exclusively by the preservation, promotion, support, assistance and improvement of Clapham Common.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lambeth
- Wandsworth
Governance
- FCC (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shirley Kermer | Chair | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margherita de Dominicis | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Jane Walker | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Hall | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Victoria de Cassan | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michiel Kermer | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Gareth Andrew James | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Edward Matthew Allnutt | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.41k | £73.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.32k | £111.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 26 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 1. TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF CLAPHAM COMMON INCLUDING TO PROMOTE BIODIVERSITY ON CLAPHAM COMMON. 2. FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SOUTH WEST LONDON ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND ACTVITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PRESERVATION, PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF CLAPHAM COMMON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Malwood Road
London
SW12 8EN
- Phone:
- 07789870809
- Email:
- friends@claphamcommon.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window