Trustees MOTTRAM ST ANDREW VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 520084
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen Hatton Chair 14 April 2014
None on record
David Martin Trustee 25 October 2021
None on record
Melinda Fretwell Trustee 25 October 2021
None on record
Anthony Peter Verdin Whitehead Trustee 20 September 2021
None on record
Jan Fogg Trustee 13 April 2018
None on record
Michael Shaw Trustee 14 April 2014
None on record
Pauline Glancy Trustee 20 October 1981
ALDERLEY EDGE AND KNUTSFORD METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
MALCOLM ELEY Trustee
None on record