CHURCHES TOGETHER IN MILTON KEYNES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity brings together Churches and other Christian Organisations to be more effective in joint mission. It maintains a data base of associated organisations and individuals and employs a part-time administrator to facilitate the setting up of projects to encourage collaborative working.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 17 August 2022: CIO registration
- 01 June 2023: Funds received from 1159204 MILTON KEYNES MISSION PARTNERSHIP
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVEREND GEORGE MUCHERU MWAURA | Chair | 17 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carol Wheatle | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Edson Dube | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Pauline Gray | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev TIMOTHY NORWOOD | Trustee | 17 August 2022 |
|
|||||
REVEREND NATHAN JAMES MARLAM | Trustee | 17 August 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY DRAWING TOGETHER CHRISTIAN COMMUNITIES FROM MILTON KEYNES AND SURROUNDING AREAS TO FURTHER THE 'FIVE MARKS OF MISSION' (WHICH HAVE BEEN ADOPTED BY THE FORUM OF CHURCHES TOGETHER IN ENGLAND AND WHICH ARE SET OUT IN THE SCHEDULE ATTACHED TO THIS CONSTITUTION) TO THE BENEFIT OF ALL THOSE LIVING WITHIN THE BOROUGH OF MILTON KEYNES AND, THROUGH OUTREACH PROGRAMMES, BEYOND THE BOROUGH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Church of Christ the Cornerstone
300-330 Saxon Gate West
Milton Keynes
MK9 2ES
- Phone:
- 01908605815
- Email:
- admin@ctmk.church
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window