THE BULGARIAN ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST JOHN OF RILA IN LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the charity is to advance for the Public Benefit the Orthodox Christian Faith and to establish, maintain and develop for the Public Benefit a parish in London, to provide liturgical services, sacrament and pastoral teaching, according to the rites and doctrines of the Orthodox Church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 07 June 2022: CIO registration
- THE BULGARIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH OF ST JOHN OF RILA IN LONDON (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Dobromir Dimitrov | Chair | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Devorina Gamalova | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kiril Ivanov | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Lambrini Ferkadis | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.53k | £182.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.27k | £35.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 14 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 14 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN FAITH TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN FAITH, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ESTABLISHING, MAINTAINING AND DEVELOPING A PARISH IN LONDON, PROVIDING LITURGICAL SERVICES, SACRAMENT AND PASTORAL TEACHING, ACCORDING TO THE RITES AND DOCTRINES OF THE ORTHODOX CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Chapel of St. John of Rila
THE BULGARIAN EMBASSY
186-188 QUEEN'S GATE
LONDON
SW7 5HL
- Phone:
- 07593649270
- Email:
- f_dobromir@abv.bg
- Website:
-
bulgarianchurchlondon.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window