ALDERLEY DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 520151
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £5.40k £5.01k £5.97k £3.93k £2.97k
Total expenditure £3.85k £8.52k £6.38k £10.17k £1.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A