ALDERLEY DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 520151
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KRISTYAN SHAW SWINNERTON Trustee 22 September 2017 None on record
MR WILLIAM BURNHAM Chair None on record
JANET HELEN WILLIAMSON Trustee 07 January 2014 None on record
CHARLOTTE APRIL O'BRIEN Trustee 23 May 2018 None on record
IAN ANTONY ROSS Trustee 11 May 2016 None on record
Beverley Giles Trustee 31 March 2020 None on record
ANDREW HOLBOROW Trustee 04 February 2018 None on record
Shereena Holborow Trustee 12 February 2020 None on record
Emma Louise Simpson Trustee 04 June 2019 None on record
MARGARET HELEN O'BRIEN Trustee 11 May 2016 None on record
Elizabeth Jane Broxton Trustee 04 June 2020
HOLMES CHAPEL WOMEN'S INSTITUTE Received: On time
Christopher Peter Tomkinson Trustee 04 June 2019 None on record