Trustees 3RD ASHTON-UPON-MERSEY SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 520155

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON MURRAY | Chair | 15 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Sean Cameron Warman | Trustee | 07 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
William Thomas Yarwood | Trustee | 07 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Fay Brocklebank | Trustee | 18 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
SALLY YARWOOD | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Adam Roberts | Trustee | 21 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Thompson | Trustee | 21 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Westhead | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALASDAIR FERRO | Trustee | 30 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
MR HARRY PEET | Trustee | 01 September 2002 |
|
|
||||
SARAH GOODSTADT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREA MORGAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT BLAIRS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.