CHEADLE AND DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 520177
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £26.18k £23.77k £23.80k £22.44k £22.06k
Total expenditure £17.24k £20.93k £21.73k £31.83k £34.38k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A