CHEADLE AND DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 520177
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STUART COX Trustee 29 June 2018
2ND CHEADLE SCOUT GROUP Received: On time
Jeanette Elizabeth Sumner Trustee 25 June 2019 None on record
Ben Cottrell Trustee 25 November 2020 None on record
Daniel Nickerson Trustee 16 October 2020 None on record
Victoria Tomkins Trustee 26 October 2020 None on record
STUART WILLIAM DYALL Trustee None on record
Tony Sumner Trustee 19 July 2018 None on record
Neil Kidd Trustee 29 June 2018 None on record
Cath Gunn Trustee 22 October 2020 None on record
MR BOB CAFFREY Trustee None on record
Peter Metcalfe Trustee 16 October 2020
2ND HEALD GREEN SCOUT GROUP Received: On time
ANDREW PETER HUGHES Trustee None on record
Nicola Mallard Trustee 12 October 2020 None on record
TANYA JANE CROSS Trustee None on record