MIDLAND UNITARIAN ASSOCIATION INC

Charity number: 1200862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

As the District Body for the Midlands, the MUA INC suppoerts the member congregations by making grants and offering advice and training.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £49,782
Total expenditure: £99,188

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City
  • Coventry City
  • Dudley
  • Northamptonshire
  • Shropshire
  • South Gloucestershire
  • Staffordshire
  • Warwickshire
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 November 2022: CIO registration
  • 09 March 2023: Funds received from 1071570 THE OLD MEETING HOUSE CHARITY
  • 10 July 2023: Funds received from 1045485 KIDDERMINSTER NEW MEETING HOUSE
  • 29 April 2024: Funds received from 500925 MIDLAND UNITARIAN ASSOCIATION
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • MUA INC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID TAYLOR Chair 01 November 2022
STOURBRIDGE UNITARIAN CONGREGATION
Received: On time
THE BENTON AND CHIDLAW MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
Peter John Flower Trustee 23 March 2023
None on record
Alexandra Claire Zglinska BA. PGCE Trustee 01 November 2022
None on record
DIANE MARGARET RUTTER Trustee 01 November 2022
None on record
Ann Felicity MATTHEWS Trustee 01 November 2022
None on record
Christine THOMPSON Trustee 01 November 2022
None on record
Susan Woolley BA M PHIL Trustee 01 November 2022
None on record
Kieren Luke Mardle-Moss Trustee 01 November 2022
THE INQUIRER PUBLISHING COMPANY (2004)
Received: 176 days late
THE GREAT MEETING HOUSE UNITARIAN CHURCH COVENTRY
Received: On time
THE BENTON AND CHIDLAW MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
Cressida Pryor Trustee 01 November 2022
None on record
DAVID MEARMAN Trustee 01 November 2022
None on record
JANE ANNE COUPER Trustee 01 November 2022
MINISTERS BENEVOLENT SOCIETY
Received: On time
Debra Sally Burbery Trustee 01 November 2022
SHREWSBURY UNITARIAN CHURCH
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £1.21m £49.78k
Total expenditure £81.96k £99.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £13.44k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A
Income - Investment £11.96k N/A
Income - Other £1.19m N/A
Income - Legacies £3.40k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £81.96k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £43.39k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £38.57k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 02 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 02 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 21 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 21 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
UNITARIAN NEW MEETING CHURCH
31 RYLAND STREET
BIRMINGHAM
B16 8BL
Phone:
02476340402