12TH SOUTH WEST CHESHIRE SCOUTS

Charity number: 520191
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 10 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 09 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 28 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required