Financial history 12TH SOUTH WEST CHESHIRE SCOUTS

Charity number: 520191
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £6.38k £8.26k £8.48k £7.83k £15.65k
Total expenditure £6.37k £9.59k £9.56k £8.35k £6.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.00k