1ST/4TH REDDISH SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 520251
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.76k £7.94k £7.97k £12.00k £6.05k
Total expenditure £8.97k £5.10k £6.37k £7.08k £6.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A