7TH MORETON (SACRED HEART) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities in accorance with the rules and regulations of the Scout Association as laid down in POR (Policy Organisation and Ruls)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
27 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wirral
Governance
- 12 February 1969: Standard registration
- 6TH MORETON SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Aspey | Chair | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katie Ashton | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Myatt | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Locke | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA LEE | Trustee | 04 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
IAN STANLEY | Trustee | 23 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
EMMA STANLEY | Trustee | 27 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANN MARY WARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID GERALD LEE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN STERLING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.68k | £21.69k | £12.10k | £11.08k | £10.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.80k | £14.15k | £10.66k | £11.25k | £17.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.43k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ASSIGNMENT DATED 20TH OCTOBER 1968 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1955
Charitable objects
UNIT OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
WIRRAL/WALLASEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Litherland Avenue
WIRRAL
Merseyside
CH46 6AL
- Phone:
- 07827441187
- Email:
- Katie_ashton20@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window