WEST WIRRAL DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 520278
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £38.76k £36.81k £57.33k £16.42k £30.93k
Total expenditure £17.56k £34.99k £56.38k £20.70k £11.39k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k