Trustees WEST WIRRAL DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 520278
Charity reporting is overdue by 179 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW ROBERT CAIN | Chair | 08 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Janet Jones | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Dawson | Trustee | 14 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Rachael Fogg | Trustee | 13 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Peek | Trustee | 13 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Stirling | Trustee | 13 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Robinson | Trustee | 13 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Claire Mankin | Trustee | 17 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kieran Murphy | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Birch | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Andrew Richard Longstaff | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Denise Ann Longstaff | Trustee | 10 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Raymond Back | Trustee | 18 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
PHILLIP THOMAS RICHARDSON | Trustee | 19 March 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.