UNITED KINGDOM ASSOCIATION FOR SUPPORTIVE CARE IN CANCER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The United Kingdom Association of Supportive Care in Cancer (UKASCC) is a new organization run voluntarily by cancer health professionals . UKASCC was founded in 2021 .UKASCCs vision is to promote excellence in the care of all those directly and indirectly affected by cancer in all four countries of the UK, by inspiring the workforce through guidelines, support, education and research
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 November 2022: CIO registration
- UKASCC (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Richard Berman | Chair | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY ANNE LOUISE HOWELLS | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Daniel Monnery | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ashique Ahamed | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
elaine Tomlins | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THAT THE TRUSTEES MUST APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES, BUT WITH AIMS AS FOLLOWS: THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM CANCER BY THE PROVISION OF: A. A PROFESSIONAL NETWORK FOR ENHANCED SUPPORTIVE CARE FOR CANCER PATIENTS, THEIR FAMILIES AND PROFESSIONALS IN THE FIELD; B. EDUCATION, SUPPORT, RESEARCH AND PROVISION OF GUIDELINES TO PROFESSIONALS AND THEIR PATIENTS IN THE CANCER ARENA AND ENSURING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF RESEARCH ARE DISSEMINATED TO THE PUBLIC; AND C. SUPPORT TO VULNERABLE CANCER PATIENTS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
149 DOVEHOUSE STREET
LONDON
SW3 6LB
- Phone:
- 02086426011
- Email:
- ukascc1@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window