LOW HESKET VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ALL AGE RANGES OF GENERAL PUBLIC. SOCIAL/HEALTH ACTIVITIES/ PROVIDE BUILDINGS/FACILITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £600 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 24 January 1964: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINE STEEL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Linda Scott | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Gibson | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Davidson | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Carr | Trustee | 04 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET BEATTIE GRAVES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GILLIAN WINSPEAR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.75k | £17.58k | £19.86k | £14.08k | £14.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.03k | £15.63k | £12.04k | £24.63k | £9.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £16.34k | £2.67k | £600 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2024 | 269 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 22ND DECEMBER 1947
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
VILLAGE OF LOW HESKET AND IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Caber Garth
Low Hesket
Carlisle
CA4 0HB
- Phone:
- 01697473592
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window