RYTON AND CRAWCROOK ALBION (YOUTH) FOOTBALL CLUB CFC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide opportunities for young people to train and play football.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gateshead
Governance
- 10 October 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin George Wilkinson | Chair | 31 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Cunningham | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Blewitt | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlie Lawson | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Jeremy Outterside | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Hall | Trustee | 31 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hands | Trustee | 31 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
DONALD WILLIAM MCCLOUD | Trustee | 31 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2023 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 14 August 2024 | 136 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 14 August 2024 | 136 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 10 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS (“OBJECTS”) OF THE CIO ARE: 3.1 TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL FOR THOSE AGED 17 AND UNDER AS DEFINED BE THE FOOTBALL ASSOCIATION AGE CATEGORIES. 3.2 TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. THE CIO SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION. 3.3 THE AREA OF BENEFIT SHALL BE CRAWCROOK AND RYTON AND ASSOCIATED SURROUNDS (MAINLY, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, POST CODE AREAS NE40 AND NE21). 3.4 TO WORK WITH OTHER LOCAL NOT FOR PROFIT SPORTS CLUBS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT TO ACHIEVE THE PURPOSES OF CLAUSE 3.2 WHERE IT IS IN THE BEST INTERESTS OF THE CIO TO DO SO.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RYTON AND CRAWCROOK ALBION (YOUTH)
KINGSLEY PARK
STANNERFORD ROAD
RYTON
NE40 3SN
- Phone:
- 07870971461
- Email:
- wilkinson.v1@sky.com
- Website:
-
racayouthfc.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window